Financial history R H SOUTHERN TRUST

Charity number: 1077509
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £54.91k £34.03k £27.36k £14.77k £12.35k
Total expenditure £770.12k £536.99k £218.23k £291.77k £320.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A