Financial history Friends of Trannack School

Charity number: 1077109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £805 £127 £4.96k £7.13k £4.16k
Total expenditure £2.51k £509 £5.84k £4.45k £4.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A