Accounts and annual returns LOSCA COMMUNITY PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1076845
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 18 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 18 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 18 August 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 18 August 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2004 Not submitted