Accounts and annual returns SNARESBROOK COLLEGE PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1076027
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2005 Not submitted