Accounts and annual returns THE KING’S CE(A) SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1076077
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 August 2024 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 August 2024 576 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 August 2024 941 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 August 2024 941 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required