Financial history GOD IN ALL EVANGELICAL MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1078528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £21.95k £21.21k £20.92k £27.48k £25.75k
Total expenditure £20.96k £35.13k £36.27k £27.78k £26.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A