Accounts and annual returns PENNY LANE MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1076490
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 February 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 22 February 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 22 February 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 22 February 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 22 February 2005 08 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2005 Not Required