Financial history JO'S TRUST

Charity Number: 1076289
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £141.76k £159.79k £149.81k £210.24k £231.69k
Total expenditure £138.57k £144.60k £175.69k £170.37k £514.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A