Financial history SEEDLINGS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1078215
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2005 30/08/2006 30/08/2007 30/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £11.83k £10.05k £8.12k £11.72k £18.74k
Total expenditure £13.80k £9.56k £10.04k £10.66k £12.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A