Financial history CREATE (CHRISTIAN REGENERATION EDUCATION ACTION TRAINING ENTERPRISE)

Charity number: 1078672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.28k £0 £0 £0 £361
Total expenditure £842 £67 £127 £60 £40
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A