Financial history INTERNATIONAL MUSEUM THEATRE ALLIANCE - EUROPE

Charity number: 1080494
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2013 31/05/2014 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017
Total gross income £4.75k £2.41k £1.02k £388 £691
Total expenditure £2.67k £6.82k £1.33k £1.01k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A