Accounts and annual returns MARRIAGE RESOURCE (SUSSEX)
Charity number: 1082135
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 27 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 December 2007 | 14 March 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 03 February 2005 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window