Financial history MERRYFIELDS PLAYSCHOOL

Charity number: 1077543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £33.01k £44.30k £50.00k £46.00k £49.93k
Total expenditure £33.16k £34.16k £45.00k £45.00k £51.99k
Income from government contracts £23.31k £36.51k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £504 N/A N/A N/A