Financial history SENGHENYDD ACTION LINKING TOGETHER (SALT)

Charity number: 1078519
Charity reporting is overdue by 1070 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/08/2016 05/08/2017 05/08/2018 05/08/2019 05/08/2020
Total gross income £3.19k £3.19k £6.68k £6.19k £3.09k
Total expenditure £4.44k £4.44k £7.08k £11.31k £3.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A