Financial history THE WEST NORWICH PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1080612
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £219.48k £211.02k £136.79k £80.72k £7.50k
Total expenditure £273.08k £190.02k £144.38k £91.81k £7.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A