Financial history JS & PCM GREIG CHARITY

Charity number: 1078376
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 05/04/2010
Total gross income £1.45k £1.24k £1.09k £884 £671
Total expenditure £3.13k £2.92k £3.49k £4.18k £4.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A