Financial history TUXFORD MINE OF INFORMATION LTD

Charity number: 1080236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.95k £14.72k £6.97k £294.59k £130.57k
Total expenditure £48.76k £38.33k £51.18k £170.35k £36.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A