Financial history THE JOSEPH AND BRENDA SIEGLER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1080989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £12.67k £9.67k £8.83k £4.89k £9.40k
Total expenditure £20.18k £11.71k £16.43k £14.77k £10.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A