Accounts and annual returns FAIR PLAY (WORKFORCE) LIMITED

Charity number: 1084466
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time