Accounts and annual returns THE ALCONBURY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 1089312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 July 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 January 2022 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required