Accounts and annual returns KENNETH PAGE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1078138
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 June 2013 01 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2013 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2012 26 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2011 18 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2010 20 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2010 Not Required