Financial history CASPARI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £93.57k £98.70k £111.37k £110.48k £111.90k
Total expenditure £117.28k £111.57k £116.02k £132.27k £119.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £30.63k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A