Financial history DERBY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1078193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £705 £1.89k £1.06k £1.33k £1.97k
Total expenditure £720 £263.21k £208.49k £3.47k £60.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A