Accounts and annual returns GOBAITH I GYMRU

Charity number: 1078107
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 September 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 August 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 September 2017 On Time