Accounts and annual returns NOTTINGHAM & EAST MIDLANDS REPETITIVE STRAIN INJURY SUPPORT GROUP

Charity Number: 1085999
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2007 18 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2006 26 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 25 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2004 25 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not Required