Accounts and annual returns THE ASHLEY JOLLY SUDDEN ADULT DEATH TRUST

Charity Number: 1079726
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 18 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 18 April 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 11 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 11 April 2005 On Time