Accounts and annual returns EMMERICH COURT DAY CENTRE LUNCHEON CLUB

Charity number: 1079926
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 20 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 20 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 30 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required