Financial history Breaking Out of the Bubble

Charity number: 1080202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £70.40k £78.12k £71.07k £104.52k £98.09k
Total expenditure £74.47k £89.75k £61.03k £95.90k £81.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A