Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN YR WYDDGRUG

Charity number: 1078777
Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £25.22k £21.47k £20.27k £22.58k £35.32k
Total expenditure £36.08k £20.90k £21.83k £21.80k £24.86k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.16k £11.32k £3.33k £3.49k £15.71k