Financial history CHAPTER AND VERSE BOOKSHOP

Charity Number: 1080519
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/10/2009
Total gross income £104.70k £106.38k £84.14k £71.21k £20.91k
Total expenditure £104.47k £103.71k £86.86k £76.83k £39.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A