Accounts and annual returns EUROPEAN SOCIAL NETWORK

Charity Number: 1079394
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 July 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On Time