Financial history THE MACE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1078888
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £5.31k £5.41k £5.45k £5.52k £5.30k
Total expenditure £8.90k £5.50k £7.65k £5.30k £6.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A