Accounts and annual returns THE RONNY BRICKMAN TRUST

Charity number: 1080178
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required