Accounts and annual returns PETER THE GREAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1080796
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 19 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 27 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required