Accounts and annual returns NATWEST COMMUNITY FINANCE FUND - THE EAST

Charity number: 1079623
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 31 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 07 November 2008 7 days late
Annual return 31 December 2006 26 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 01 November 2006 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 01 November 2006 1 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 11 November 2005 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required