Financial history SHEEP DIP LANE PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1081008
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.46k £18.67k £17.90k £18.26k £14.92k
Total expenditure £15.82k £15.90k £22.34k £16.97k £15.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A