Financial history BRITISH MUSLIM WOMAN & CHILDREN'S SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1088730
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £127.80k £83.19k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £142.35k £104.32k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A