Accounts and annual returns ST. JOSEPH'S PRE-SCHOOL AYLESBURY
Charity number: 1080075
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 25 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 22 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 30 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 30 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 14 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 14 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 23 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window