Accounts and annual returns COLNE OPEN DOOR CENTRE

Charity number: 1080104
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 15 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 12 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2006 06 July 2007 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 06 March 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2005 16 June 2006 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 22 February 2006 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2004 17 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 17 January 2005 On Time