Trustees 5TH SUTTON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1079154
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Wallace | Chair | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS GEORGE MURRAY AMPHLETT | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Driver | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Adams | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dean Whitehead | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
TONI LINDA WALLACE | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Louise Amphlett | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ALEC STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.