Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN OUTREACH MINISTRY AND EDUCATION ( COME )

Charity Number: 1079477
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2009 11 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 11 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2008 08 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 08 April 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2007 14 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 14 May 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 24 May 2007 On Time