Financial history BRISTOL'S LEAGUE FOR CATS

Charity number: 1080766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £723 £391 £494 £10.40k £285
Total expenditure £2.86k £1.66k £873 £1.47k £849
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A