Financial history WALTHAM FOREST VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity Number: 1082426
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £135.04k £158.68k £290.17k £165.42k £116.06k
Total expenditure £134.68k £158.65k £218.46k £239.97k £139.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A