Accounts and annual returns QAYYUM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1081106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2023 05 June 2024 217 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 21 December 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 19 October 2022 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 20 November 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required