Accounts and annual returns CHERNOBYL CHILDREN HOLIDAY FUND

Charity Number: 1082651
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 28 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 10 March 2009 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required