Financial history ISLAND FARM DONKEY SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1081795
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2004 30/04/2005 30/04/2006 30/04/2007 30/04/2008
Total gross income £91.93k £116.26k £158.25k £134.50k £113.84k
Total expenditure £91.71k £85.95k £86.41k £85.23k £73.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A