Financial history THE FRIENDS OF CRANMER HOUSE

Charity number: 1080756
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.09k £8.38k £5.39k £5.52k £14.23k
Total expenditure £22.31k £12.33k £6.84k £7.90k £14.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A