Financial history THE ENABLING ACTIVITIES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1080176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.81k £7.94k £5.02k £7.11k £17.14k
Total expenditure £68.84k £69.35k £70.86k £72.88k £396
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A