Financial history SHAFTESBURY HOUSING GROUP CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1080464
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £443 £2.45k £1.27k £812 £419
Total expenditure £29.00k £1.88k £28.35k £14.56k £11.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A