Financial history TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY ( BRIXTON )

Charity number: 1084889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £62.07k £55.56k £58.59k £72.87k £89.74k
Total expenditure £44.17k £46.91k £60.10k £73.63k £98.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A